judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation, JEANNE L. JOELSON, SHEENA JOELSON/SHOOPMAN, BOBBIE CHARLES CRAVER v. DONALD PEARSON, a/k/a DONALD E. PEARSON

Case Heading (S-07-0068)
Case Number:S-07-0068Case Docketed On:03/23/2007
Linked To: S-07-0071
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation, JEANNE L. JOELSON, SHEENA JOELSON/SHOOPMAN, BOBBIE CHARLES CRAVER v. DONALD PEARSON, a/k/a DONALD E. PEARSON
Full Title:WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation, JEANNE L. JOELSON, SHEENA JOELSON/SHOOPMAN, BOBBIE CHARLES CRAVER, Appellants (Defendants), v. DONALD PEARSON, a/k/a DONALD E. PEARSON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWest America Housing CorporationMary Elizabeth Galvan
AppellantJeanne L. JoelsonMary Elizabeth Galvan
AppellantSheena Joelson-ShoopmanMary Elizabeth Galvan
AppellantBobbie Charles CraverMary Elizabeth Galvan
AppelleeDonald PearsonDon W. Riske
Sean Charles Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 184
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/23/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/23/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/18/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of motion for extension of time to secure supersedeas bond (filed 02/28/07)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Other motion to set hearing on defendants' motion for extension of time to post supersedeas bond (filed 06/28/07)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/16/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/16/2007Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Diane at District Court Clerk's Office. She stated that there is a hearing on the record we have requested this week. The record will be late in arriving.EventPhone CallFinal
07/24/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/11/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal