judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANTIAGO (MARCOS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34643
Short Caption:SANTIAGO (MARCOS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147690Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07310
08/26/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remove Case from Fast-Track. 99-08016
09/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 26, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion requesting that this appeal be exempted from the requirements of NRAP 3C. The motion is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order. 99-08686
10/04/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-09498
10/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 4, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is denied. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed within 15 days of this order. 99-09838
10/28/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10556
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Fast Track Statement. 99-11040
11/18/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion to Strike Fast Track Statement and Counter Motion to Amend Fast Track Statement Appendix. 99-11457
11/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 8, 1999. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 99-11569
12/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion to strike is denied. The appellant's counter-motion to supplement the fast track statement is granted. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the amended appendix provisionally submitted on November 18, 1999. The state shall file the fast track response within 15 days of this order. 99-12124
12/06/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Amended Appendix to Fast Track Statement. (This amended appendix was attached to the Opposition filed November 18, 1999). 99-12125
12/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-13020
04/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05364
05/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07139
05/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2000. 00-07139