judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICE, STANLEY R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1253
Short Caption:RICE, STANLEY R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4201-79Filed Date:10/30/1980

Opening Event Date:10/30/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/24/1984
Argued/Submitted:01/07/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Susan L. Schneider YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Raymond M. Hertz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICE, STANLEY R. UNITED STATES
10/30/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1983FiledRecord Completed
09/24/1984FiledBriefing Completed
01/07/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/23/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition