judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER' S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: LANCE TALBOT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-12-0016)
Case Number:S-12-0016Case Docketed On:01/20/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER' S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: LANCE TALBOT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER' S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: LANCE TALBOT, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLance J. TalbotBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Brenda Sue Yamaji

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 134
Citation:286 P.3d 1040

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/20/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received with attachementsNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/20/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/20/2012Order - Sanction - notice of appeal with attachmentsOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - Filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
01/27/2012Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
03/05/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/14/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/18/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
10/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/13/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 11/15/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal