Case Information: 18-CV-0209 | |||
Short Caption: | RECAI ISKENDER V. CRIME AND VICTIMS COMPENSATION OFFICE | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB6311-17 | Filed Date: | 02/23/2018 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/23/2018 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 03/30/2018 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/11/2018 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Recai Iskender | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Crime and Victims Compensation Office | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
02/23/2018 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
02/23/2018 | Filed | Mediation Screening Statement | ||
03/23/2018 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
03/23/2018 | Filed | No Transcript Needed | ||
03/30/2018 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
03/30/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
03/30/2018 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/06/2018 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
05/21/2018 | Filed | Ordered that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. | ||
06/19/2018 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
06/19/2018 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
07/11/2018 | Filed | Mandate |