judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERRY ALLEN v. JOYCE ANDERSON

Case Heading (S-10-0215)
Case Number:S-10-0215Case Docketed On:10/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JERRY ALLEN v. JOYCE ANDERSON
Full Title:JERRY ALLEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. JOYCE ANDERSON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerry AllenMatthew David Winslow
AppelleeJoyce AndersonAlex Hellmuth Sitz III

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Personal
Opinion Number:2011 WY 94
Citation:253 P.3d 182

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received (Notice of Appeal was received, but without required attachments)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/04/2010Event - Phone Call - Called Clerk of District Court and requested pleadings necessary for docketing appeal. Received documents by fax this date.EventPhone CallFinal
10/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/04/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appeal (no attachments included)OrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/08/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
11/03/2010Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
11/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Stay Appeal Until Bond is Established by Trial CourtEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/18/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/18/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief, Appellant's Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay Appeal Until Bond is Established by Trial Court and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2010Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
01/04/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/07/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/24/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/16/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/22/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
06/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing with Brief in Support of the Same and Request that the Matter be Set for Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal