judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROADWAY TO REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY DANIEL GALLAGHER: J & T PROPERTIES, LLC v. DANIEL GALLAGHER

Case Heading (S-10-0213)
Case Number:S-10-0213Case Docketed On:10/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROADWAY TO REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY DANIEL GALLAGHER: J & T PROPERTIES, LLC v. DANIEL GALLAGHER
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROADWAY TO REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY DANIEL GALLAGHER: J & T PROPERTIES, LLC, Appellant (Respondent), v. DANIEL GALLAGHER, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJ & T Properties, LLCRobert Todd Ingram
AppelleeDaniel GallagherKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:2011 WY 112
Citation:256 P.3d 522 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/19/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
11/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record for appellee.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/05/2011Event - Phone Call - Called counsel and requested signed original signature pages for Brief of Appellee.EventPhone CallFinal
01/07/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2011Event - Phone Call - Called counsel and again requested original signature pages of Brief of Appellee. Spoke with Debra and she will get them in the mail today.EventPhone CallFinal
01/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Daniel GallagherEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/01/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/21/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal