judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERICK JAMES AGUILAR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0214)
Case Number:S-10-0214Case Docketed On:10/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Wyoming Rules of Criminal Procedure
Short Title:ERICK JAMES AGUILAR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ERICK JAMES AGUILAR, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantErick James AguilarDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/18/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/02/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/03/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal