judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRAVEN RANDALL CASPER V. KATHERINE NEDELKOFF

Case Information: 11-FM-0619
Short Caption:CRAVEN RANDALL CASPER V. KATHERINE NEDELKOFFClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO607-11Filed Date:05/12/2011

Opening Event Date:05/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/13/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCraven Randall Casper N
Brian W. StolarzNY
AppelleeKatherine Nedelkoff N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/31/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on May 18, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11(b)(3)(A). (JAC)
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX
06/15/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
07/25/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledDismissed
09/13/2011FiledMandate