judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK D. BRODERICK v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Case Heading (S-12-0021)
Case Number:S-12-0021Case Docketed On:02/07/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:MARK D. BRODERICK v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Full Title:MARK D. BRODERICK, Appellant (Defendant) v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark BroderickStephen R. Winship
AppelleeWyo Central Federal Credit UnionThomas M. Hogan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Bankruptcy
Opinion Number:2012 WY 116
Citation:285 P.3d 941

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/26/2012Brief - Appellant (two copies of brief uploaded)BriefAppellantFinal
03/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's brief and Appellant's Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
05/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, WYO Central Federal Credit Union; Appellee's Request for Assignment to Expedited Docket and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/24/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/30/2012Brief - Appellant reply (Certificate of Service and Brief are dated June 1, 2012)BriefAppellant replyFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/26/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional Authorities by the Appellee, WYO Central Federal Credit UnionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/21/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/21/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/25/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 9/24/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal