Case Information: 19-CM-0299 | |||
Short Caption: | LORENZO ADAMS-JENKINS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CMD14899-18 | Filed Date: | 04/08/2019 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/08/2019 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 07/11/2019 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/10/2020 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/21/2020 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/31/2020 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Lorenzo Adams-Jenkins | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/08/2019 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
04/23/2019 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
04/23/2019 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Jesse Winograd, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
05/21/2019 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
06/18/2019 | Filed | Record Index | ||
06/18/2019 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
06/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (Request for Revocation Removals, Presentence Report, Memorandum Opinion, Sentencing Decision) Sealed | ||
07/11/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (15 pages/tape) 12/20/18 a.m. proceeding | ||
07/11/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (69 pages/tape) 12/20/18 a.m. proceeding | ||
07/11/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (17 pages/tape) 3/8/19 proceeding | ||
07/11/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (5 pages/Richer) 4/24/19 proceeding | ||
07/11/2019 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/16/2019 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
08/26/2019 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
09/16/2019 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before October 10 2019 | ||
10/08/2019 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/28/2019 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before November 22, 2019 | ||
11/21/2019 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
11/21/2019 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
12/23/2019 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
12/30/2019 | Filed | Corrected Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
01/22/2020 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) | Granted | |
02/10/2020 | Filed | Order Granting appellee's motions for extensions of time to file the brief, filing the lodged brief and granting appellee's motion to supplement the record | ||
02/10/2020 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
02/10/2020 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/24/2020 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
04/14/2020 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
05/21/2020 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judge Glickman, Associate Judge Beckwith, Associate Judge Easterly | ||
08/03/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (government exhibit #1 - cd) | ||
08/07/2020 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ | ||
08/20/2020 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | ||
08/31/2020 | Filed | Mandate |