judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER, and BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER v. RICHARD L. CLEMENT, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DAISY CLEMENT, Deceased

Case Heading (S-10-0217)
Case Number:S-10-0217Case Docketed On:10/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER, and BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER v. RICHARD L. CLEMENT, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DAISY CLEMENT, Deceased
Full Title:CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER, and BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF CASTLE ROCK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a CASTLE ROCK CONVALESCENT CENTER, Petitioners, v. RICHARD L. CLEMENT, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DAISY CLEMENT, Deceased, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerCastle Rock Hospital DistrictBillie LM Addleman
Melissa Rae Theriault
PetitionerBoard of Directors of Castle Rock Hospital DistrictBillie LM Addleman
Melissa Rae Theriault
RespondentRichard L. ClementJohn H. Robinson
Diana Sampson Rhodes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/05/2010Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
10/05/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - file response/objectionMotionExtension of time - file response/objectionFinal
10/20/2010Order - Denying respondent's request for extension to file responseOrderDenyFinal
10/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion for extension of time to file responseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2010Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
10/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petitioner's Writ of Review and Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2010Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
10/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal