judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOBBY RAY SCHAPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0299)
Case Number:S-11-0299Case Docketed On:12/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BOBBY RAY SCHAPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BOBBY RAY SCHAPER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBobby Ray SchaperTina N. Olson
Diane M. Lozano
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/10/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/20/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
03/20/2012Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
04/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal