Case Information: 20-FM-0394 | |||
Short Caption: | HENOK ARAYA V. AIDA KELETA | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Lead: | 20-FM-0393 | Consolidated: | 20-FM-0394 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DRB3351-09 | Filed Date: | 06/12/2020 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/12/2020 | Case Status: | Briefing Completed |
Record Completed: | 10/06/2020 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/15/2021 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Henok Araya | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Aida Keleta | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/12/2020 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
07/02/2020 | Filed | Record Index - 20-FM-394 | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 20-FM-393 & 20-FM-394 | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Order Directing Mediation Screening Statement | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Mediation Screening Statement | ||
07/13/2020 | Filed | Appearance by Rina Desai and Elisa Mason (Appellee Keleta) | ||
07/15/2020 | Filed | Referred to Mediation | ||
07/17/2020 | Filed | Screened Out | ||
07/20/2020 | Filed | Initial Order - Directing Statement Regarding Transcripts | ||
07/22/2020 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant Araya) | ||
08/03/2020 | Filed | Response to Appellant's statement regarding transcripts (Appellee Keleta) | ||
08/04/2020 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant Araya) | ||
09/29/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (115 Pages/ Rogers) 9/16/19 proceeding | ||
09/29/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #2 (137 Pages/ Rogers) 9/17/19 proceeding | ||
09/29/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #3 (77 Pages/ Rogers) 9/18/19 proceeding (Part I) | ||
09/29/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #4 (82 Pages/ Rogers) 9/18/19 proceeding (Part II) | ||
09/29/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #5 (125 Pages/ Austin) 9/20/19 proceeding | ||
10/05/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #6 (122 Pages/ Wood) 11/19/19 proceeding | ||
10/06/2020 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/07/2020 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
11/16/2020 | Filed | Brief (Appellant Araya) | ||
11/16/2020 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant Araya) | ||
12/02/2020 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Keleta) | Granted | |
12/07/2020 | Filed | Opposition to appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant Araya) | ||
12/18/2020 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Keleta) - 1/15/21 | ||
01/15/2021 | Filed | Brief (Appellee Keleta) | ||
01/15/2021 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/04/2021 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant Araya) | ||
02/05/2021 | Filed | Notice Received (Appellant Araya) |