judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY LEE CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0298)
Case Number:S-11-0298Case Docketed On:12/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:GARY LEE CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY LEE CARTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Lee CarterDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Richard E. McKinnon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 109
Citation:282 P.3d 167

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/09/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/28/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/28/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kirk Morgan obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/18/2012Order - Oral argument - amending schedule (Case moved to 05/16/2012)OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
04/24/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Redacted Pleadings. Volume IV, Exhibits, was not designated and therefore not transmitted.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Richard E. McKinnon obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt, and Burke (Kirk Morgan for Appellant; D. Michael Pauling and Richard E. McKinnon, argument by Mr. McKinnon for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/13/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 8/10/12 by agent for warden at WMCI.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 8/28/12 by agent for warden at WMCI.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/30/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/28/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal