judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAVON D. ROBERTS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0595
Short Caption:JAVON D. ROBERTS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-23598-09Filed Date:05/13/2011

Opening Event Date:05/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/14/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/12/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/30/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJavon D. Roberts YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/10/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-582, 11-CF-595 and 11-CF-638 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Michael Spekter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-582. F/O that Richard Stolker, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-595. F/O that Corylee Carlye, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-638. F/O that counsel for all appelalnts shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Richard Stolker, Esquire in appeal no. 11-CF-595
06/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cory Lee Carlye, Esquire in appeal no. 11-CF-638.
06/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (Marshall) (RT ORDERED (pii))\
06/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (Curry) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
07/15/2011FiledOrder directing statement regarding transcript for Javon D. Roberts.
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file (Roberts) Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant Javon D. roberts' motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript. F/O Consolidating appeals nos. 11-CF-967, 11-CF-582, 11-CF-595 and 11-CF-638. F/O INITIAL ORDER.
09/02/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) for 11-CF-595 (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (13 pgs/tape) 11/5/09 proc.
09/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (9 pgs/Hunt) 11/17/09 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (23 pgs/Ott) 3/1/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (17 pgs/Gilliam) 4/6/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (41 pgs/Ott) 5/28/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (27 pgs/Davis) 7/12/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (25 pgs/McCarn) 8/19/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (15pgs/Henderson) 9/15/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (17 pgs/Henderson) 9/23/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (14 pgs/Gilliam) 10/18/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (44 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 1/7/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (33 pgs/Hawkins) 1/10/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (44 pgs/Pirfo) 1/10/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (89 pgs/McCarn) 1/28/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (114 pgs/McCarn) 2/1/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (212 pgs/Rogers) 2/2/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (223 pgs/McCarn) 2/3/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (62 pgs/Rogers) 2/4/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (307 pgs/McCarn) 2/7/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (237 pgs/Rogers) 2/8/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (285 pgs/McCarn) 2//9/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (214 pgs/Rogers) 2/10/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (158 pgs/McCarn) 2/11/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #24 (250 pgs/Rogers) 2/14/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (6 pgs/tape) 2/14/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #26 (171 pgs/McCarn) 2/15/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #27 (253 pgs/Rogers) 2/16/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #28 (151 pgs/McCarn) 2/17/11 proc
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #29 (4 pgs/tape) 2/18/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #30 (241 pgs/McCarn) 2/22/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #31 (80 pgs/Rogers) 2/23/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #32 (108 pgs/McCarn) 2/28/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #33 (22 pgs/Richer) 3/2/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #34 (21 pgs/Gilliam) 3/3/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #35 (17 pgs/Richer) 3/4/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #36 (47 pgs/Hunt) 5/6/11 proc. w/cd
09/14/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-595)
09/14/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-595)
09/14/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #37 (SEALED pleadings)
09/15/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-638)
09/15/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-638)
09/15/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-967)
09/15/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-967)
09/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #38 (SEALED pleading)
10/14/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant Michael T. Walters to submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave, wi/in 15 days.
10/28/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File statement regarding transcripts (Appellant) (Titled as: Motion to Accept Statement)
11/02/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave of appellant Michael T. Waters to file the lodged statement regarding transcript.
11/02/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (WALTERS)
11/09/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until February 17, 2012 (Joint motion for all aplts) (Appellant)Granted
12/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #39 (SEALED orders)
12/16/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-582)
12/16/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-582)
12/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting joint motion of appellants for extension of time to file aplts' briefs and limited appendixes to 2/17/12.
02/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/17/12.
05/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) Curry, Marshall, Roberts, & WaltersGranted
05/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) Curry, Marshall, Roberts, & Walters to 7/17/12.
07/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) Motion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/7/12
11/07/2012FiledJoint Motion For Extension Of Time to File briefs and appendixes (Curry, Marshall, Roberts and Walters)Granted
11/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time to File briefs and appendixes (Curry, Marshall, Roberts and Walters) to 1/6/13
01/07/2013FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged (Curry) Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/07/2013FiledBrief (Walters) (Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledBrief (Marshall) (Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledAppendix (Marshall) (Appellant)
01/09/2013FiledMotion to adopt portions of co-appellant's argument (Appellant)Granted
01/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Roberts) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/11/2013FiledTMC//MTOION TO FILE LODGED EXCESS PAGED BRIEF//MOTION TO ADOPT PORTIONS OF CO-APPELLANT'S BRIEF//MOTINO FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
01/22/2013FiledMotion to adopt certain arguments of co-appellant's. (Curry) (Appellant)Granted
01/30/2013FiledORDER GRANTING CURRY'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE CURRY'S LODGED BRIEF and APPENDIX and WALTERS & CURRY'S MOTIONS TO ADOPT PORTIONS OF CO-APPELLANTS' BRIEF ARE GRANTED and ROBERTS' MOTION IS GRANTED and the CLERK SHALL FILE ROBERTS' BRIEF and APPELLEE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/N 30 DAYS
01/30/2013FiledBrief (Curry) (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledAppendix (Curry) (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledBrief (Roberts) (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant) ROBERTS
02/05/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/08/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 4/30/13
03/19/2013FiledLetter From appellant titled as Emergency Motion to Stay Appellate Proceedings (Appellant)
04/30/2013FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
04/30/2013FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/01/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGE BRIEF//MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD
05/14/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTIONS and the CLERK SHALL FILE the LODGED BRIEF and the DOCUMENTS ATTACHED to the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT
05/14/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify #40 (APPELLEE'S EVIDENTIARY AID DOCUMENTS)
05/14/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/14/2013FiledBriefing Completed
05/17/2013LodgedMiscellaneous - transcripts of recorded telephone calls. (Appellee)
06/03/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/05/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
06/14/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Curry) (Appellant)
06/26/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/08/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/23/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Curry) (Appellant)
08/27/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Update)(Curry) (Appellant)
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/10/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until October 29, 2013 (Titled as: Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief)(Joint Request) (Appellant)Granted
10/29/2013FiledOrder Granting aplts' joint motion to file reply briefs.
10/29/2013FiledReply Brief (Curry) (Appellant)
10/29/2013FiledReply Brief (Marshall) (Appellant)
10/29/2013FiledReply Brief (Roberts) (Appellant)
10/29/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Walters)
11/08/2013FiledLetter responding to request (via telephone) for photo array at issue in Curry's appeal. (photo array attached) (Appellee)
11/12/2013FiledArgued Before Associate Judge Fisher, Associate Judge Thompson, and Associate Judge Easterly. (Michael L. Spekter Esq ., for appellant Shawn R. Curry) (Cory Lee Carlyle Esq.,for appellant Alonzo D. Marshall) (Richard S. Stolker Esq.,for appellant Javon D. Roberts) (Thomas T. Heslep Esq.,for appellant Michael T. Walters) (Nicholas P. Coleman Esq.,for appellee).
03/20/2014FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
04/18/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
05/19/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges)
05/21/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing en banc (Walters) (Appellant)Granted
05/28/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Roberts) (Appellant)
05/28/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time file petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to June 20, 2014. (WALTERS)
06/09/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Marshall) (Appellant)
06/11/2014FiledMandate (11CF595) & (11CF638) **********RECALLED IN (11CF595) ON 6/25/14
06/11/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing (Curry) (Appellant)Granted
06/18/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Walters) (Appellant)Denied
06/19/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and Motion for Extension of time to File Petition for Rehearing/ Rehearing En Banc (Roberts) (Appellant)Granted
06/24/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PERH/RECALL MANDATE
06/25/2014FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE (11CF595) and...
06/25/2014FiledF/O APPEALS (11CF595) & (11CF638) are DECONSOLIDATED and F/O DIRECTING the CLERK TO RECALL the MANDATE (11CF595) and...
06/25/2014FiledF/O GRANTING MOET (11CF595) and DIRECTING the PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC TO BE FILED W/N 90 DAYS
07/01/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Curry) (Appellant)Denied
09/29/2014FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ROBERTS)
09/30/2014FiledMandate
11/20/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)Granted
11/24/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
12/01/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
07/13/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file motion to recall the mandate
07/13/2015FiledOrder Denying Motion to recall the mandate
01/23/2019FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a second motion to recall the mandate Motion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
01/23/2019FiledTMC
06/12/2019FiledORDER DENYING appellant's motion for enlargement of time to file the lodged motion to recall mandate