judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4232
B-4232
09/19/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY CO.
ROBERT A. TURNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/05/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/10/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1974Opinion issued
07/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/19/1974Opinion issued
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
10/10/1973Response to Petition
09/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/19/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert A. TurnerRespondent
Hartford Accident and Indemnity Co.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information