Case Information: 20-CO-0378 | |||
Short Caption: | CHAD E. HAWTHORNE V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF1-9475-17 | Filed Date: | 06/02/2020 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/02/2020 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 07/10/2020 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/28/2020 | ||
Expedited | Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Chad E. Hawthorne | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/02/2020 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/17/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record -#1 (29 pages/Armstrong) 6/23/17 proceeding | ||
06/17/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (59 pages/Armstrong) 6/26/17 proceeding | ||
06/17/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (8 pages/Tape) 5/13/20 proceedings | ||
06/17/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (15 pages/Tape) 5/14/20 proceeding | ||
06/18/2020 | Filed | Ordered, Sua Sponte, that this appeal is hereby expedited and counsel for appellant shall file a motion for summary reversal within 30 days from the date of this order | ||
06/18/2020 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
06/18/2020 | Filed | Appointing Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to June 3, 2020 Steven Kiersh, Esquire | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Record Index | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Supplemental Record #5 (sealed portions of the record) | ||
07/10/2020 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/16/2020 | Filed | Motion For Summary Reversal (Appellant) | Denied | |
07/20/2020 | Filed | TMC | ||
07/22/2020 | Filed | Motion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee) | Granted | |
07/22/2020 | Filed | Appendix (Appellee) | ||
07/23/2020 | Filed | Motion For Summary Reversal (Appellant) | Denied | |
08/05/2020 | Filed | JUDGMENT DENYING appellant's motion for summary reversal... F/O GRANTING appellee's motion for summary affirmance... | ||
08/05/2020 | Filed | Affirmed | ||
08/28/2020 | Filed | Mandate | ||
09/24/2020 | Lodged | Letter From Pro Se Appellant to inform The Court counsel has violated Rule 16 (Appellant) |