judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT MCGUIRE v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections and the ATTORNEY GENERAL, of the State of Wyoming

Case Heading (S-10-0205)
Case Number:S-10-0205Case Docketed On:09/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:ROBERT MCGUIRE v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections and the ATTORNEY GENERAL, of the State of Wyoming
Full Title:ROBERT MCGUIRE, Petitioner, v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections and the ATTORNEY GENERAL, of the State of Wyoming, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerRobert McGuire Pro Se
RespondentRobert O. LampertBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
RespondentAttorney General's Office - Attorney GeneralBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2010Petition - Writ - habeas corpusPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
09/21/2010Motion - In forma pauperis (cover letter referring to page 9-B of petition)MotionIn forma pauperisFinal
09/21/2010Event - Phone Call - AG's Office. Advised them that case was being docketed and asked if they had received their copy. They received theirs yesterday.EventPhone CallFinal
09/29/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpusEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2010Response/Objection - Other - Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Attorney GeneralResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
10/12/2010Order - Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusOrderDenyFinal
10/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/18/2010Event - Rejected Filing - returned "Additional Jurisdictional Points and Authorities or as Petition for Rehearing" without filing.EventRejected FilingFinal