judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

IVAN LANGFORD v. KARL E. KRAFT

Case: B-4234
B-4234
09/20/1973
Application for Writ of Error
IVAN LANGFORD
KARL E. KRAFT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/28/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
12/31/1973Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/04/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
01/28/1974Response to Petition
12/31/1973Brief in Support of Petition
12/27/1973Motion for Rehearing
10/04/1973Response to Petition
09/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/20/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Karl E. KraftRespondent
Ivan LangfordPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information