Case: 13-97-00102-CR
13-97-00102-CR
02/20/1997
Robbery
Brown, Glen Dora
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/02/1998 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |
08/26/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/11/1998 | Record returned | | |
07/15/1998 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
06/22/1998 | Court of Crim. Appeals Number | | |
06/19/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct. | | |
06/15/1998 | Petition for Review | | |
05/26/1998 | Motion for Extension of Time Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/05/1998 | Motion for Extension of Time Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/30/1998 | XPetition for Discretionary Review | | |
03/26/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/29/1997 | Submitted | | |
10/29/1997 | Submission | | |
09/19/1997 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
09/19/1997 | Submission | | |
08/18/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
08/18/1997 | Oral argument requested | | |
08/07/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/07/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
08/07/1997 | No oral argument requested | | |
07/17/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/10/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/09/1997 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/09/1997 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
06/06/1997 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/06/1997 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
05/29/1997 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/14/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/20/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/20/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/26/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Robert C. Lassmann Hon. Michael A. Sheppard |
Brown, Glen Dora | Appellant | Glen Dora Brown Hon. W. A. 'Bill' White |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
De Witt
Honorable Whayland W Kilgore
95-11-8754
60 yrs TDC & ct costs