judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS ALLEN STASTNY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0206)
Case Number:S-10-0206Case Docketed On:09/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:THOMAS ALLEN STASTNY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:THOMAS ALLEN STASTNY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas Allen StastnyGregory J. Blenkinsop
Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
Diane M. Lozano
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 138
Citation:261 P.3d 747

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/15/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/16/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Gregory J. Blenkinsop for AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/11/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Eric AldenMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/11/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/11/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/11/2011Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw and Motion for Third Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
04/01/2011Event - Phone Call from office of Public Defender, withdrawal of counsel included all Cheyenne staff. Case participants edited.EventPhone CallFinal
04/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal (Called counsel and requested Certificate of Service with signatures)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/05/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellant. Brief was rejected with comment at 4:45 p.m. Monday for failure to make redactions.BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
04/05/2011Event - Rejected Filing - as untimely two attempts to file brief.EventRejected FilingFinal
04/05/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
04/07/2011Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
04/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Verified Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and Reinstate AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2011Event - Phone Call - requested that hard copies of brief sent for filing in the event case be reinstated be discarded due to a minor being named in the body.EventPhone CallFinal
05/03/2011Order - Reinstatement - Order reinstating appeal and order granting motion to supplement the record.OrderReinstatementFinal
05/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/09/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel indicating that the hard copies of the brief of appellant have been sent by overnight mail this date. No further action necessary.EventPhone CallFinal
05/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - E-filing service system error - service notification not sent by e-mail until 5/10/2011. Adjusted tickler date to reflect actual date of service by system.EventOtherFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/23/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas, Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Leda M.Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/29/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/18/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/18/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/21/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal