judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

USMAN AWAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0592
Short Caption:USMAN AWAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD70-11Filed Date:05/13/2011

Opening Event Date:05/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUsman Awan Y
Ubong E. AkpanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Magdalena AcevedoNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ubong Akpan, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/01/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ubong Akpan, Esquire
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (104 pgs. -- Tape) (4/14/11 proc.) with CD.
06/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX
07/01/2011RECORD COPIES
08/08/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/08/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Oct. 7, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time until October 7, 2011
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
10/11/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed
01/06/2012FiledMandate