judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARL ANTHONY DIMINO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0014)
Case Number:S-12-0014Case Docketed On:01/17/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:CARL ANTHONY DIMINO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CARL ANTHONY DIMINO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarl Anthony DiminoDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Lucas James Esch

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2012 WY 131
Citation:286 P.3d 739 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/17/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2012Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/18/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/05/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/28/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 10/24/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal