judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4221
B-4221
09/13/1973
Application for Writ of Error
TOM T. ALLEN
GORDON H. MONK AND EARLINE C. MONK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/07/1974Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/23/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/28/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/13/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1974Response to Motion filed
02/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/30/1974Opinion issued
01/07/1974Supplemental Brief filed
10/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
10/23/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/28/1973Response to Petition
09/13/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/13/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tom T. AllenPetitioner
Gordon H. Monk and Earline C. MonkRespondent
Joe E. ColemanAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information