judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL TROY SANDERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0009)
Case Number:S-12-0009Case Docketed On:01/12/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL TROY SANDERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL TROY SANDERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Troy SandersDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/28/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/28/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/29/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/16/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/16/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/17/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/24/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
05/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/25/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal