Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
07/16/2020 | Filed | PETITION FOR EMERGENCY COURT OF APPEALS RULE AMENDMENT | |
07/31/2020 | Filed | Notice M-269-20: Requesting Comments Regarding Diploma Privilege. | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Edward Ruse | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Deborah Merritt | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [support] Bruce Lehman | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Hilary Escajeda Comments | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Richard Douglas Comments | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Rachel Lesser | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Imara McMillan | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Devon Minnic | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Beverly Jennison | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Amanda Nicole | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Katelyn Davis | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Anne Reynolds | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Paul Pettie | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Richard Douglas | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Josh Zuckerman | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Joan Gilliam | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Stephen Marencic | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Clara Mora | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Andreas Moffet | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Christopher Taylor | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Chris LaFon | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Mindy Daniels | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] C. Kane | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Dahye Kang | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Amit Sujanani | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Donald R. Johnson | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Avocates | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Jackson Fuchs | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Jackson Myers | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Tommy La Voy | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Christian Nestor | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Alicia Dixon | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Ebony Johnson | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Nabeel K | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] COA from L. Castello | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Brian Meadors | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Jamie Taroni, Jr. | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Cristian Mendoza | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Michael Lantrip | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Andrea Villegas | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Julie Bean | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Gaines Rowe | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Taylor Henry | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [support] Steven Chernoff | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] David Remus | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Natalie Salmanowitz | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Michael D. Sullivan | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Madaline Buck | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Jim Bagarazzi | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Peter Owen | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Kerry Neal | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Michael MacNeil | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Josh Gross | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Nate Clark | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Daniel Roth | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Eli Wachtel | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Joseph Newton | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Ricardo Rodriguez | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Ingrid Quionnes | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Yalin Medez | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Krysteen Cruz | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Henry Olivera | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Elizabeth Francisco | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Daniella Maninolfi | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Meghan Chung | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Jerzie Rodriquez | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | Imara McMillian | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Tamyra Fuentes | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Carlos Torres | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Leslie Bennett | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUGGESTION] Hilary Escajeda | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Joe Baier | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Nicole Durbin Felix | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Daniel Huynh | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Evan Monod | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Vivian Pierre | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Joan Piere | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Alexander Long | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Rachel Goldman | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Raider Marc | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Mike Lynch | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Shakiva Pierre | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Jennifer Narvaez | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [QUESTION] Nathan Kingree | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Emma Duncan | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Lindsey Riccihi | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Daniel Passon | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Addie Gamliel | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Martina Williams | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] David Wall | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPORT] Joe Baier | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Mark Widerschein | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Paige Brownlow | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Hannah Eliza Gordon | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Lindsey Staubach | |
07/31/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] David Jones | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [OPPOSE] Julie Bean | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Kara Osborne | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Paulette Kessler | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Sean Gray | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Chris Boyne | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Andrew Kriha | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Philip Doerr | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Michael Carroll | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Katie Ladipus | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Burd Diploma Privilege Comment | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Cyrus Raafat | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Ashley Reed | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Carrie Wolford | |
08/01/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Kristen Kortick | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [SUpport] John Braun | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Scot Stone | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Randall Carroll | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Kenneth Lechter | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Jia Wooley | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Anna Marx | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Ben Kessler | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support} Tom Gutierrez | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [support] Anna Noone | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Elysia Glasscock Public Comment | |
08/02/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Anne Noone | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Barbara Andrade | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Andrew Coughlin | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Joseph Morsette | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] John Braun [2] | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Khary Anderson | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Bill West | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lauren Petrin | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] David Lehr | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lafuria | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Hank Perrits, Jr. | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Rachel Gentry | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Vincent Jankoski | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Pimprapat Ayudhaya | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Jennifer Bisgaier Comment | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Brian Blomain | |
08/03/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Claudia Angelos | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] O. Mbonu | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Frederick Edwards | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Stephanie Macinnes | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Katrin Marquez | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Y. Pilipovskiy | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Cornell Law School | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Pamela Gist | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Daniel Burd | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Zack Kessler | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Felix Zhang | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Alyse Ullery | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Leonard Gendelberg | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Gena Britt | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lou Battino | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] M Goot | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Linda Sun | |
08/04/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Victoria Randozzo | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rabia Abbass | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Randy Ricks | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Randy Ricks 2 | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Erik Lampmann - Public Comment in Support of Petition Before the Court of Appeals | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [support] barbra andrade | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Jarryd Page | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Derek Centola | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Cody Mexiner | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Robert Klonoff | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Michael Connors | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Annalise Strange | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Renessia Bailey | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] S. Apedo | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Duke Law | |
08/05/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Jill Himmer | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Mae Christine Bowen | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sarah Rosenberg | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Suggestion] Honorable Nathan L. Hecht for the ABA | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [support] Holvin Velez | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Suggestion] Kadijah McDowell | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Luis Fortuno | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Valencia Richardson | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Augustine Gonzales | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Rachel Shekell | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Kayla Scott | |
08/06/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Eric Stocking | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Congresswoman Elenaor Holmes Norton | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Alex Thompson | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Emily Kvalheim - DC Court of Appeals - Public Comment in Response to Notice No. M-269-20 | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Caroline Philips | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Zachery Lee | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Erwin Chimerisky and 11 other Law School Deans | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Alex Thompson--DC Diploma Privilege Comment_Berkeley Law Graduates | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [Support} Katie Aizpuru | |
08/07/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Namiri Kim | |
08/08/2020 | Lodged | [Oppose] Matthew Kaplan | |
08/08/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Eileen Kaufman | |
08/08/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Kimiya Gilani | |
08/09/2020 | Lodged | [Sopport] Charles Pescovitz | |
08/09/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tafari Plummer | |
08/09/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Robert Chang | |
08/09/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Ann Stevens | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Andrea Anne Curico | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Chelsea Brite | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Perry Adair | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Keri D. Foster | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alexis Christensen | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Sienna Haslup | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Benjamin Wilson | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] DC Bar applicant | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Thalia Garcia2 | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Yeddy Rodriguez | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Yadeline Rodriguez | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tiffany Garcia | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Icela Mendez | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rene Garcia | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] John Rodriguez | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Sashar Rodriguez | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Neria | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Carlos Villegas | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Yennifer Saliva | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Petter Dickerson | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] DongYeon Cho | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Daniela Sirimarco | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Amneh Minkara | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Alisha Jarwala, Will Dobbs-Allsopp, and Becca Ellison | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tiffany Garcia | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Concerned Applicant | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Concerned Applicant 2 | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] WIlliam Mabry | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Paul Fagan | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lance Huston | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Suggestion] Shanelle Van | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Brooke Hollmann | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support and suggestion] Wallace Mlyniec | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lydia Parenteau | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | {Support} Monica Woolley | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tejinder Khera | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [support] Annamaria Morales-Kimball | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Eliya Bernstein | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Kelvin Allen | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Caitlyn Kretzschmar | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Sahil Sheth | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Charles Pescovitz | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Julie Z | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Nico Ramos | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Elizabeth Philipp | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Peter Connolly | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Mark Clifford | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Katie Aizpuru | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Christopher Gerber | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Adam Colber | |
08/10/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Joseph Morgan | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Steve Peters | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Diana Jarek | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Gary DePalo | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Joshua Fershee and Other Law school Deans | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Wasserstein, David | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sahar Taskshi | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Applicant-Comment-Emma | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Aris Hart | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashley Hutto Schultz | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Austin Plier | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ciara Beaulieu | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Corey Fitzpatrick | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Darryn Mumphrey | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] David St. John Public Comment Letter | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Desiree Hall | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Erica Turret | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Erwin Chemerisnky 2.0 | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Hannah Bingham | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alexander Hussey | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Richard Markel | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Julyana Dawson | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rafael Santiago | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Molly Prindle | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Melanie English | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Matthew Itzkowitz | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Loren Reichsfeld | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kayla Svihovec | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Katherine Daw | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Karim Georges | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kaitlin Logan Wimmer | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] John Gurtunca | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sarah Ottone | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jess Hutto-Schultz | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jermall Keels | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jarrod Carman | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Irma Sandoval | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Xinge He | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Terry Reed | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sean Fresh | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Spencer Kaye | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tina Tang | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Amy Chau | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sarah Templin | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Dearden | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kristen Scherb | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rachel Clarke | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Silber | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Priya Patel | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] LaFonda Willis | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sarah Mysiewicz | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] christina Canalizo Decker | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Bryan Reines | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Candice Savoy letter | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Candice Savoy answers | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rachel Wehr | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashley Arthur | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [oppose] Joe Yost | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Nancy Lopez -- Washington Counsel of Lawyers | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Connor Mulvey | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Dean of UPENN Law | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Haaleh Katouzian | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sean Ossi | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Raymond Ngu | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Bryce Freeman | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Mariah Hines | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Ben Orlebeke | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Thomas Garrity | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Marissa Ditkowsky | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nicholas Kennedy | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Colm Cross | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] DP4DC Public Comment--Initial Petitioners | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Charleene Smith | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Scott Novak | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Dr. Amy Cooper | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Caroline Cecot | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Stacy James Lacroix | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jennifer Enos | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alexander Rubel | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Peter Young Kim | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Eric Steele II | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Charlie Rodriguez | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashley Woods | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Thalia Garcia | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ana Blanco | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Yadeneis Garcia | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jose Mendez | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Kate Rheaume | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Maureen Wilkerson | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [suggestion] Colleen Reichsfeld | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [SUPPORT] Daniel Huynh | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Michael Wakefield | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jennifer Larson | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Daniel Kees | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Travis Stoller | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Shekinah Apedo | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sherelle T. Carper National President of NANBPWC | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashley Luong | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Lucy Dicks-Mireaux | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] DP4MD | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Andrew Longhi | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Paul Brite | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashley Morris | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nicolle Wainer | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Holly Kresge | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Helena Hahm | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Edward Crosland | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] DC Deans 3 | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Andrew Glenn | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nancy Drane-- Access to Justice | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] DC Deans 2 | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [support] DC Deans | |
08/11/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Nicole Wittstein and other Duke Law students | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Arlyn Upshaw | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Emmalyn McCarthy | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Willistine harris | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Eliza Rumsey Reply to Notice | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Wes fisher | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Dinesh K. McCoy | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] ABA Virgin Island... young lawyers division | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] CLEA statement | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Claire Shimberg | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jessica Johnson Public Comment | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Le Pham | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Giao Tran | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nicole Carle | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] David Henrie | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Marcy Romm | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Meg Browder | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nicole Carrol | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ariana Rowberry | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Carl Wilkerson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ethan Phong | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Quentin Ward | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Joseph Kiessling | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Melody Alemsourt | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rebecca Scaife | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tyler Green | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Blacke Aherton | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Eric Anderson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Barry Romm | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Vanessa Jacobsen | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rachel Mink | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tawanna Lee | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Mark Ladipus | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Samuel Romm | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Julie Smith | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Claytrice Henderson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Gabriela Hybel | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support]Lisa Keshavarz | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Victoria Glover | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Julia May | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Distinction] Rachel Wehr | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] John Cimko | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alicia Dixon 2 | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Bartholomew | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alicia Loh | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Reginal Renwick | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Memmi Rasmussen | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Gregory Hawkins | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] David Kahn | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Katie Gaziano | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Gabe Newland | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jenna Russo | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Elizabeth Sachs | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Cesar Renaro | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Damilola Arowolaju | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Maria Russell | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Karla Devera | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sidrah Miraah-Raza | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rachel Ungar | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Zoubida Altayib | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Don Pelto | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Daniel Wolman | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Samuel Thomas | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Mira de Jong, Comment on Emergency Diploma Privilege | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Henry Dana | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alden Fletcher | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Stephanie glaberson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kyle Gutierrez | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alex Lichtenstein | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Laura Shellum | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Marianne Deagle --Loyola University Chicago School of Law | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] stephen Palmer | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | Memo Style | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kimberly Blasey | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Eric Irving | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] De Vann Sago | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rabia Abbas2 | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Anne Cole | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sandra Sellers | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Chinelle Ekanam | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Stephanie Andrews | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] NDLSA2 | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Rebecca Brunty | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Lyle Poisson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Ledyard | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alan King | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Jamie Cernek | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Caroline Eader | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Joy Agcaolli | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Theodore Warner | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Ashton Copeland | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Michael Ende | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Amanda Barnes | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Hanan Zaki | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] DPFDC-- Licensed Attorneys | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kathrine Cruz | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] James Young | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] A DC attorney | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Open Letter from Deans | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Open letter from Public Interest Organizations | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Paul Koster-Emory Law | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alyssa Leader | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Irene Jung | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] sidarth Menon | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] DMV area Deans and Faculty | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] National Disabled Law Students Association | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jason Chun | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Raymond Navarro | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Nuzhat Chowdhury | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kaitlin Logan Wimmer--supplement | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Taylor Wilson | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kathryn Marshall | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Sarah Ravitz | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Andrea Fenster | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Amanda Triplett | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Larry McCammon | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Tim Zubizarreta | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Limayli Huguet | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Helen Reynolds | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Riley Horan | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jeanette Bravo | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Abigail Reynolds | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Taylor Jones | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Stephanie Neitzel | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] stephanie Breen | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Elizabeth Crivaro | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Robin Nagel | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Karen Newton Cole Neighborhood Legal Services | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Margaret O'Hara | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Alexis Carra | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Kylah Clay | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] LiJia gong | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Halima Nur | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Joy Mateo | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Britteny Leyva | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Luis Navarro | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Carl Bergquist | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] NDLSA | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] NDLSA 3 | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Joshua Fershee and Other Law school Deans, updated | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Natalie Koss | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jackie Brune | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Jeremy gordon | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support[ Arnab Datta | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Thomas Carr | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Holly Easton | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] OAG Karl Racine | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [Support] Avis Buchanan--Public Defender Service | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Beth Schwartz | |
08/12/2020 | Lodged | [support] Omar Melehy ---Metropolitan Washington Employment Lawyers Association | |
09/15/2020 | Filed | Order granting in Part emergency petition. | |
09/18/2020 | Lodged | Statement in response to the court's order granting in part petitioners' emergency petition. (Applicant, Other) | |
09/24/2020 | Filed | ORDER promulgating D.C. Bar R. 46-A, Emergency Exam Waiver | |
09/25/2020 | Filed | PETITION FOR EMERGENCY AMENDMENT OF RULE 46-A (Petitioner Campion, Petitioner Carson, Petitioner Dhanoa, Petitioner Glasscock, Petitioner McCammon, Petitioner Pescovitz, Petitioner Smith, Petitioner Wall) | Denied |
09/28/2020 | Filed | Order Denying petitioners' Emergency petition to amend D.C. App. R. 46-A | |
10/02/2020 | Filed | Motion to Amend Rule 46(A) (Applicant, Other) | Denied |
10/08/2020 | Filed | Order Denying motion to Amend Rule 46(A) | |