judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRYSTAL ETTRIDGE V. ROBERT TURTIL

Case Information: 17-FM-0011
Short Caption:CRYSTAL ETTRIDGE V. ROBERT TURTILClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3833-16Filed Date:01/05/2017

Opening Event Date:01/05/2017Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/08/2017Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/31/2018
Argued/Submitted:01/07/2019
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/07/2019

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCrystal EttridgeNPro SeY
AppelleeRobert TurtilN
Rebekah SullivanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/05/2017FiledNotice Of Appeal
01/17/2017FiledInitial Order - Directing Statement Regarding Transcripts
02/06/2017FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Denied
02/06/2017FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
02/06/2017FiledOpposition to motion to dismiss. (Appellant)
02/07/2017FiledTMC - Motion to dismiss // opposition
02/21/2017FiledOrder Denying motion to dismiss
03/06/2017FiledSupplemental Record #1 (66pages/Tape) 9/27/16 proceeding (Part 2)
03/08/2017FiledRecord Completed
03/10/2017FiledBriefing Order
04/18/2017FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant)Granted
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #2 (8pages/Tape) 9/1/16 proceeding
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #3 (64pages/Tape) 9/13/16 proceeding
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #4 (115pages/Tape) 9/27/16 proceeding (Part 1)
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #5 (108pages/Tape) 10/13/16 proceeding
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #6 (115pages/Tape) 11/10/16 proceeding
05/12/2017FiledSupplemental Record #7 (128pages/Tape) 11/29/16 proceeding
05/18/2017FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) - 6/27/17
05/19/2017FiledRecord Copies
05/19/2017FiledRecord Index
06/28/2017FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant)Granted
07/14/2017FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to September 5, 2017
08/11/2017FiledSupplemental Record #8 (20pages/Tape) 9/9/16 proceeding
08/11/2017FiledSupplemental Record #9 ( 26pages/Tape) 10/7/16 proceeding
08/14/2017FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant)Granted
08/17/2017FiledMotion and Notification to Preserve Evidence (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
08/17/2017FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Denied
08/18/2017FiledOpposition to Appellant's Motion and Notification to Preserve Evidence (Appellee)
10/02/2017FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Granted
10/10/2017FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to Appellee's Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
10/10/2017FiledOpposition to Appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to Appellee's Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)
01/03/2018FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) & Motion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to Appellee's Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
01/03/2018FiledOrder Denying Motion and Notification to Preserve Evidence (Appellant) & Motion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)
01/03/2018FiledOpposition to motion to dismiss. (Appellant)
01/16/2018FiledMotion To Reconsider Order of January 3, 2018 (Appellant)Granted
01/18/2018FiledOpposition to Appellant's Motion To Reconsider Order of January 3, 2018 (Appellee)
01/31/2018FiledChange Of Address Received From Rebekah J.H. Sullivan Esq.
01/31/2018FiledAmended Change Of Address Received From Rebekah J.H. Sullivan Esq.
03/09/2018FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reconsider Order of January 3, 2018 (Appellant) & directing brief and appendix
03/23/2018FiledMotion for clarification of March 9, 2018 order by the court and for relief. (Appellant)Denied
04/09/2018FiledOrder Denying Motion for clarification of March 9, 2018 order by the court and for relief. (Appellant)
04/09/2018FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)
04/09/2018WithdrawnDismissed
05/01/2018WithdrawnMandate
05/08/2018FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant)Granted
05/11/2018FiledOpposition to motion to reinstate the appeal (Appellee)
05/15/2018FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Granted
05/17/2018FiledOpposition to Appellant's Motion To Recall The Mandate (Appellee)
05/29/2018FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply to Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Recall Mandate, Motion to Reinstate Appeal (Appellant)Granted
06/07/2018FiledOrder directing appendix/Appellants' motions to reinstate, recall the mandate & to file reply held in abeyance
06/20/2018FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
07/03/2018FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeal & Recall Mandate
07/03/2018FiledReply to Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeal, Motion to Recall Mandate (Appellant)
07/03/2018FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/03/2018FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/31/2018FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/31/2018FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/2018FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
09/10/2018FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief, supplement the record ant stay (Appellant)Granted in Part/Denied in Part
10/05/2018FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) - 10/18/18 & all other relief is denied
11/30/2018FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/07/2019FiledMotion for Continuance of Hearing until additional information is submitted (Appellant)Denied
01/07/2019FiledSubmitted To Associate Judge Thompson, Associate Judge Easterly, Senior Judge Ruiz (Crystal Ettridge, Pro Se) (Rebekah Sullivan, Esquire)
10/16/2019FiledAffirmed by MOJ
11/07/2019FiledMandate