judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONNA RAY TEEPLES v. NEAL J. TEEPLES

Case Heading (S-12-0007)
Case Number:S-12-0007Case Docketed On:01/09/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DONNA RAY TEEPLES v. NEAL J. TEEPLES
Full Title:DONNA RAY TEEPLES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. NEAL J. TEEPLES, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonna Ray TeeplesRichard Mathey
AppelleeNeal J. TeeplesWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2012 WY 127
Citation:286 P.3d 134

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/09/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/09/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/09/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/17/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Amended index from district court clerk;Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/04/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of Designation of Record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/19/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/02/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/02/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume, II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/18/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal