Case: 98-0558
98-0558
06/15/1998
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
GUILLORY FARMS INC.
AMIGOS CANNING CO. INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/14/1998 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/15/1998 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/04/1998 | Case Stored | | | |
11/04/1998 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | order sent to COA | | |
10/01/1998 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | petition denied | |
09/25/1998 | Petitioner's reply brief | | | |
09/14/1998 | Response to Petition | | | |
08/20/1998 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | M/e/t to file response is granted until 9-23-98. | |
08/19/1998 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | "M/E/T TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REVIEW" | | |
08/17/1998 | Call received | from Mr. Toscano, advising that he will file an m/e/t to file response | | |
08/17/1998 | Call received | from Mr. Baker, advising that he does not oppose m/e/t | | |
07/22/1998 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | response is due to be filed no later than August 24, 1998 | | |
06/23/1998 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/22/1998 | Response Waiver filed | | | |
06/15/1998 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/04/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 16-J-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
GUILLORY FARMS, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Zack M. Zbranek Mr. Richard G. Baker |
AMIGOS CANNING CO., INC. | Respondent | Ms. Julie Karee' Cain Mr. Gene Toscano |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-95-00063-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
966 SW2d 830, 04-09-98
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable EARL B. STOVER
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Liberty
46,941