judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4223
B-4223
09/14/1973
Application for Writ of Error
EZRA CHARLES BRANTLEY
CITY OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/09/1974Notice of Appeal filedPetitioner
12/05/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/28/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/14/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/09/1974Notice of Appeal filed
01/07/1974Motion to Withdraw Filed
12/05/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/28/1973Response to Petition
09/14/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/14/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of DallasRespondent
Ezra Charles BrantleyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information