judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROALENE McCARTHY v. ROBERT REDLAND, Individually, ROBERT REDLAND, as Trustee of the Robert and Irene Redland Family Trust Dated August 10, 1989, LISA KIMSEY and MIKE KIMSEY

Case Heading (S-12-0012)
Parent: S-12-0010 Case Docketed On:01/13/2012
Consolidated: S-12-0011 , S-12-0012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:ROALENE McCARTHY v. ROBERT REDLAND, Individually, ROBERT REDLAND, as Trustee of the Robert and Irene Redland Family Trust Dated August 10, 1989, LISA KIMSEY and MIKE KIMSEY
Full Title:ROALENE McCARTHY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT REDLAND, Individually, ROBERT REDLAND, as Trustee of the Robert and Irene Redland Family Trust Dated August 10, 1989, LISA KIMSEY and MIKE KIMSEY, Appellees (Defendants.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoalene McCarthySteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeRobert RedlandJ. Kenneth Barbe II
Ronald P. Jurovich
AppelleeLisa KimseyJ. Kenneth Barbe II
Ronald P. Jurovich
AppelleeMike KimseyJ. Kenneth Barbe II
Ronald P. Jurovich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Estates - Trusts, Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:2012 WY 148
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/13/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/13/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/01/2012Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
03/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief, Designation of Record, Motion to Consolidate AppealsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/08/2012Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
03/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply of Appellee Robert Redland to Motion for ConsolidationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2012Order - Consolidating cases (consolidating for purposes of oral argument and decision)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/18/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Robert RedlandEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Roalene McCarthy; and received copy of Designation of No Additional Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from C. M. Aron obo Appellant McCarthyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from J. Kenneth Barbe obo Appellant Robert RedlandNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/24/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, ten volumes. Volumes I-VII, Original Papers; Volumes VIII-IX, Transcripts; Volume X, Trial Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/24/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from S. Joseph Darrah obo Rolly & Kendrick Redland & Teresa SheltonNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2012Motion - Strike (Docket S-12-0011)MotionStrikeFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Ronald P. Jurovich obo Robert RedlandNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/05/2012Response/Objection - Motion to Strike (Docket S-11-0011)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Steve C.M. Aron and Stephen Joseph Darrah appearing on behalf of Appellants in S-12-0010 and S-12-0012; J. Kenneth Barbe II and Ronald P. Jurovich appearing on behalf of Appellants in S-12-0011) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/21/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/06/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
12/06/2012Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
12/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing by Appellee Robert Redland; Brief of Appellee Robert Redland in Support of Petition for Rehearing; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/18/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
12/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Boxes 2 of 3 and 3 of 3 signed for 12/21/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Box 1 of 3 signed for 12/21/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal