Case Information: 17-CV-1410 | |||
Short Caption: | 800 SOUTHERN AVENUE, LLC V. ROWENA JOYCE SCOTT | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB18598-17 | Filed Date: | 12/14/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/14/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 01/25/2018 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/28/2018 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/01/2019 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/15/2019 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | 800 Southern Avenue, LLC | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Rowena Joyce Scott | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/14/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
01/11/2018 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
01/22/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
01/25/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record 1 (24 pages/tape 10/25/17 proceeding) | ||
01/25/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record 2 (27 pages/tape 11/16/17 proceeding) | ||
01/25/2018 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
02/02/2018 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
03/14/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
03/23/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | ||
04/19/2018 | Filed | Ordered that appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time | ||
04/23/2018 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
05/07/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) It is Further ordered that appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 6, 2018. | ||
05/07/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
05/07/2018 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
06/06/2018 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee) | Denied | |
06/19/2018 | Filed | Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant) | ||
06/21/2018 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/06/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant). It is Further Ordered that appellee's motion to dismiss is denied. It is Further ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed with this court on or before July 30, 2018. | ||
07/06/2018 | Filed | Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant) | ||
08/02/2018 | Filed | Ordered that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time | ||
08/28/2018 | Filed | Ordered that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and appellant's brief alone | ||
08/28/2018 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/29/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
12/20/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
02/01/2019 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judges Beckwith, Easterly and McLeese. | ||
10/24/2019 | Filed | Reversed And Remanded by MOJ | ||
11/15/2019 | Filed | Mandate |