judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TODD ROGERS, AN EMPLOYEE OF R.A. MANNING CONSTRUCTION v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-12-0001)
Case Number:S-12-0001Case Docketed On:01/03/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TODD ROGERS, AN EMPLOYEE OF R.A. MANNING CONSTRUCTION v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TODD ROGERS, AN EMPLOYEE OF R.A. MANNING CONSTRUCTION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTodd RogersJack Daniel Edwards
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 117
Citation:284 P.3d 815

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution filed in District courtNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
02/17/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/03/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/23/2012Motion - Extension of time - otherMotionExtension of time - otherFinal
04/23/2012Order - Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/24/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/01/2012Event - Phone Call to Mr. Edwards. He has been out of the office and the hard copy of the motion was mailed yesterday.EventPhone CallFinal
05/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/01/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/25/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/25/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 9/28/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal