judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LABOR COMMISSIONER VS. DOUGLAS COUNTY

Case Information: 35038
Short Caption:LABOR COMMISSIONER VS. DOUGLAS COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 99CV0184Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/05/1999 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10577
11/05/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/12/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. September 8, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 99-11166
11/16/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
11/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 8, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 99-11701
01/19/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-00868
01/19/2000Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 00-00869
01/19/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-00871
02/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-02088
02/09/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.