judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: PATRICK J. CHRISTMAS, SR. BAR REGISTRATION NO. 85985

Case Information: 16-BG-1204
Short Caption:IN RE: PATRICK J. CHRISTMAS, SR. BAR REGISTRATION NO. 85985Classification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DDN376-16Filed Date:11/21/2016

Opening Event Date:11/21/2016Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar Counsel
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Julia L. PorterNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional Responsibility
Robert C. Bernius NN
RespondentPatrick J. ChristmasN
Thomas B. MasonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/21/2016FiledNotice of Discipline under Rule XI s. 11 and a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland placing respondent on inactive status and removing his name from the register of attorneys in Maryland due to his claim of incapacity.
12/22/2016FiledOrdered that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order. (ETW)
01/03/2017FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause that respondent consents to the imposition of an indefinite suspension due to disability. (Respondent)
01/11/2017FiledLetter From Disciplinary Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
01/26/2017FiledSuspended