Case: C-9410
C-9410
01/05/1990
App Writ of Error
LAVOYD WAYNE
COUNTY OF COMANCHE AND COMANCHE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/1990 | Notice of Appeal filed | REC'D COPY OF MO/STAY MANDATE;CALLED HARDIN AND ADVISED TO FILE WITH COA (BEP) | | |
03/22/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/16/1990 | Reply to Response | Respondent | ON BEHALF OF COUNTY OF COMANCHE, TX | |
01/05/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/1990 | Notice of Appeal filed | REC'D COPY OF MO/STAY MANDATE;CALLED HARDIN AND ADVISED TO FILE WITH COA (BEP) | | |
04/11/1990 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | REHEARING OVERRULED | |
04/11/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | REHEARING OVERRULED | | |
03/29/1990 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
03/22/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
03/07/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | application denied with additional order. | W/NOTATION:'SANCTIONS IN THE AMT OF FIVE X TOT TAXABLE COSTS ASSESSED AGAINST PET, PAYABLE TO RESP, JOINTLY & SEV | |
01/25/1990 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/25/1990 | No description available. | | | |
01/16/1990 | Reply to Response | ON BEHALF OF COUNTY OF COMANCHE, TX | | |
01/12/1990 | Notice requesting filing fee | | | |
01/05/1990 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS | | |
01/05/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BOBBYE ALLEN | Respondent | Ms. Beverly Willis Bracken |
JOHN H. MCLEOD | Respondent | Mr. Keith Woodley |
BETTY CONWAY | Respondent | Ms. Beverly Willis Bracken |
W.G. (SHILO) GORMAN | Respondent | Mr. Keith Woodley |
JAMES E. MORGAN | Respondent | Ms. Beverly Willis Bracken |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-89-00124-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 10-26-89
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
220th District Court
Comanche
Honorable James E. Morgan
31-88