judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEATHERSPOON (MARKUS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38505
Short Caption:WEATHERSPOON (MARKUS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39461 , 42761 , 64231 , 64739 , 64739-COA , 72846 , 72846-COA , 80227 , 80227-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C168895Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15915
09/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 14, 2001 and May 15, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 01-16075
10/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16714
10/08/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/6/00; 2/27/01; 3/2/01; 5/7/01; 5/8/01; 5/9/01; 5/10/01; 5/11/01; 6/28/01; 7/6/01. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 01-16832
12/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file a transcript request form with the clerk of this court. Because we are unable to determine whether all transcripts necessary for the review of this appeal have been filed with this court, appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form setting the specific trial or hearing dates to be transcribed. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-21419
12/31/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Certificate of Service of Transcript Request (w/attached Request for Transcripts of Proceedings filed in district court on 9/14/01.) Transcripts requested: 09/6/00, 2/27/01, 3/2/01, 5/16/01, 6/28/01, 7/6/01. To Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 01-21953
01/24/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Appellant's Appendix). 02-01671
01/24/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: January 18, 2002. 02-01672
02/04/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 24, 2002. The clerk shall file the appellant's appendix received on January 28, 2002. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief within 30 days from the date of this order. 02-02201
02/04/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 4. 02-01821
03/06/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: James Tufteland. 02-04045
03/06/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-04046
04/22/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
09/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-15842
09/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
10/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to amend the judgment of conviction consistent with this order." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-17376
11/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-17386
11/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/02/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Certification of Entitlement to Excess Fees on Appeal. 02-20577
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 7, 2002. 02-17386
04/18/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Denying Motion for Certification of Entitlement to Excess Attorney Fees. On December 2, 2002, attorney David C. Amesbury filed a motion requesting this court to certify his entitlement to excess fees for his representation of Markus Weatherspoon at the appellate level. An attorney must present a claim for fees in excess of the statutory minimum at the appellate level to the district court that appointed him. We deny Mr. Amesbury's motion. 03-06633