judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREENCORE PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC v. BARLOW RANCH, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Heading (S-12-0039)
Case Number:S-12-0039Case Docketed On:03/01/2012
Linked To: S-12-0038
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:GREENCORE PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC v. BARLOW RANCH, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Full Title:GREENCORE PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BARLOW RANCH, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGreencore Pipeline Company, LLCJon T. Dyre
Timothy M. Stubson
AppelleeBarlow Ranch, Limited PartnershipDan B. Riggs
Mistee Lyn Elliott
Amanda Kay Roberts

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Easements, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2013 WY 34
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
03/01/2012Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
03/01/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/07/2012Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/11/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Briefs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/20/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Greencore Pipeline Company, LLC; and received coy of brief on CD.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Barlow Ranch, Limited PartnershipEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Greencore Pipeline Company, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/16/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Timothy Stubson and/or Jon Dyre obo Greencore Pipeline Co.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Dan B. Riggs and Mistee L. Elliott obo Barlow RanchNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Mistee Lyn Elliott and Dan B. Riggs for Barlow Ranch; Jon T. Dyre and Timothy M. Stubson for Greencore) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/19/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirmed in part, and reversed and remanded in part. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2013Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
04/03/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Greencore Pipeline Co., LLC's Combined Petition for Rehearing and Supporting BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2013Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/23/2013Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
04/23/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/23/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/23/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/26/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 4/24/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal