judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FERDIE A. MILLER, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0642
Short Caption:FERDIE A. MILLER, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6067-03Filed Date:05/24/2011

Opening Event Date:05/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFerdie Miller Y
Donna L. BidermanNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/24/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on May 24, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
06/16/2011RECORD INDEX
06/16/2011RECORD COPIES
06/16/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/22/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and on further consideration of this court's order of June 13, 2011, it is ORDERED that Donna Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (dfe)
06/22/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donna Biderman, Esquire
07/28/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the statement regarding transcript accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
08/05/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to file (Appellant)Granted
08/05/2011FiledMotion To Remand (Appellant)Granted
08/18/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed and granting appellant's motion to stay appeal and remand to the extent that the appeal is dismissed and the case is hereby remanded to the Sperior Court
08/18/2011Filedstatement re transcript (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledRemanded
08/18/2011FiledMandate