judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES HENRY and BARBARA HENRY, Husband and Wife v. GEORGE BORUSHKO and LUCILLE BORUSHKO, Husband and Wife

Case Heading (S-12-0028)
Case Number:S-12-0028Case Docketed On:02/23/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JAMES HENRY and BARBARA HENRY, Husband and Wife v. GEORGE BORUSHKO and LUCILLE BORUSHKO, Husband and Wife
Full Title:JAMES HENRY and BARBARA HENRY, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. GEORGE BORUSHKO and LUCILLE BORUSHKO, Husband and Wife, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Henry Pro Se
AppellantBarbara Henry Pro Se
AppelleeGeorge BorushkoWilliam L. Miller
AppelleeLucille BorushkoWilliam L. Miller

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property, Water Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 104
Citation:281 P.3d 729

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/23/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/22/2012Event - Phone Call to Appellants requesting additional copy of brief. Will send.EventPhone CallFinal
03/26/2012Brief - Appellant and Designation of Record on Appeal (Certificate of Service blank, due date for Appellees calculated from filing date)BriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/29/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/16/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/17/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal