judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RENE KITTLES v. LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT JUDGE ROBERTA COATES and LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT CLERK KERRI YARTER

Case Heading (S-12-0018)
Case Number:S-12-0018Case Docketed On:01/25/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Mandamus
Short Title:RENE KITTLES v. LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT JUDGE ROBERTA COATES and LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT CLERK KERRI YARTER
Full Title:RENE KITTLES, Petitioner, v. LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT JUDGE ROBERTA COATES and LARAMIE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT CLERK KERRI YARTER, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerRene Kittles Pro Se
RespondentCatherine R. RogersGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
RespondentRoberta A. CoatesGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/25/2012Motion - In forma pauperis incorporated in petitionMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
01/25/2012Petition - Writ - mandamusPetitionWrit - mandamusFinal
01/25/2012Event - Phone Call to AG to advise them this was filed and no service made on the StateEventPhone CallFinal
01/26/2012Service - Other. AG's office picked up copy of petition this date.ServiceOtherFinal
02/07/2012Petition - Other - Request to join this petition with January 25, 2012 petition before this court. No service on AG.PetitionOtherFinal
02/08/2012Event - Phone Call from Attorney General, will not respond to latest filingEventPhone CallFinal
02/22/2012Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
02/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal