judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAMIREZ VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADA

Case Information: 38485
Short Caption:RAMIREZ VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A432740Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/17/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15598
09/14/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-16535
10/17/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-17547
10/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn3[Although appellant was not granted leave under NRAP 46(b) to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. Appellant was granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, by order dated March 30, 2001, and so no filing fee is due in this appeal.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-21194
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-00535
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00535