judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JUAN CARLOS VALDEZ VENEGAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0025)
Case Number:S-12-0025Case Docketed On:02/21/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:JUAN CARLOS VALDEZ VENEGAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JUAN CARLOS VALDEZ VENEGAS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJuan Carlos Valdez VenegasBert T. Ahlstrom Jr.
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 136
Citation:287 P.3d 746

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/21/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/21/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/09/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Additional Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/08/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for additional time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/07/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk; two volumes: Volume I, original papers, volume II, transcripts and confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/30/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/15/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal