judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6860
A-6860
05/19/1958
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHERN CANAL COMPANY
STATE BOARD OF WATER ENGINEERS, ET AL., CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/30/1958Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/10/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/31/1958Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/30/1958Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/23/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/03/1958Letter Filed
10/30/1958Post submission brief filed
10/17/1958Letter Filed
10/10/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/08/1958Miscellaneous letter
06/25/1958Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1958Brief on the Merits
05/30/1958Response to Petition
05/28/1958Letter Filed
05/23/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/19/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Graves, Dougherty and GeeAmicus Curiae
State Board of Water Engineers, et al.Respondent
Southern Canal CompanyPetitioner
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioRespondent
Jones, Gregg, Shaver and RaymerAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information