judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TONY SERNA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,

Case Heading (S-12-0273)
Case Number:S-12-0273Case Docketed On:12/14/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:TONY SERNA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,
Full Title:TONY SERNA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTony Serna Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2013 WY 87
Citation:305 P.3d 1142

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/14/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/30/2013Motion - Extension of time - brief; and received proposed order.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/30/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/04/2013Brief - Appellant (Confidential and illegible not scanned)BriefAppellantFinal
03/04/2013Motion - Request for Intermediate ReliefMotionOtherFinal
03/04/2013Motion - Application for Multiple SubpoenasMotionOtherFinal
03/04/2013Event - Phone Call to Attorney General's office re filing of these pleadings.EventPhone CallFinal
03/19/2013Order - Denying Request for Intermediate Relief and Order Denying Application for Multiple SubpoenasOrderDenyFinal
04/18/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/18/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/29/2013Motion - Extension of time - brief (reply)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/29/2013Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
05/06/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/07/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2013Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/16/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/16/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/01/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/01/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/01/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/01/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/05/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/2013.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal