judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, and WHITE CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. CONVERSE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC

Case Heading (S-12-0060)
Case Number:S-12-0060Case Docketed On:03/16/2012
Linked To: S-12-0061
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, and WHITE CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. CONVERSE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC
Full Title:NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, and WHITE CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellants (Petitioners), v. CONVERSE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthern Laramie Range Foundation, a Wyoming nonprofitPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppellantNorthern Laramie Range Alliance, a Wyoming nonprofitPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppellantWhite Creek Ranch, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Converse County, WyomingQuentin W. Richardson
AppelleeWasatch Wind Intermountain, LLCBrent R. Kunz
Lucas Evan Buckley
John A. Masterson
Alaina M. Stedillie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Natural Resources
Opinion Number:2012 WY 158
Citation:290 P.3d 1063 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/19/2012Service - Mail returned. Docketing letters sent to Appellants returned for insufficient postage. Due date for brief recalculated and resent.ServiceMail returnedFinal
05/04/2012Brief - Appellant and Statement of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Northern Laramie Range Foundation, Northern Laramie Range Alliance, LLC, and White Creek Ranch, LLC, Statement of Costs and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2012Brief - Appellee (Wasatch Wind Intermountain, LLC)BriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Wasatch Wind Internountain, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellee Converse County Board of County CommissionersBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/09/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Northern Laramie Range Foundation, Northern Laramie Range Alliance, LLC, and White Creek Ranch, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Peter C. Nicolaysen obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from John A. Masterson obo Appellee Wasatch WindNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Pamela M. Brondos and Peter C. Nicolaysen, argument by Mr. Nicolaysen for Appellants; Lucas James Esch, for Wyoming DEQ; and John A. Masterson, Alaina Marie Stedillie, argument by Mr. Masterson for AppelleeWasatch Wind) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/7/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal