judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL L. JACKSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0703
Short Caption:MICHAEL L. JACKSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF18415-10Filed Date:06/09/2011

Opening Event Date:06/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/24/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael L. Jackson Y
T. Gail Maddox-LevineYY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
John J. WoykovskyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/23/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
07/06/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (50pgs/Tape) 5/11/11 proc. w/CD
08/23/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/31/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/31/2011FiledRecord Index
09/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 4, 2011
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until December 19, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 19, 2011
11/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledAppendix - attached to Brief (Appellant)
12/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before April 2, 2012
03/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until June 1, 2012 Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before June 1, 2012
05/04/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
05/16/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
05/18/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO//MOTION TO SUPP REC
05/23/2012FiledOpposition to Appellees' Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
10/31/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE the EXHIBITS AS A SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD and APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED
10/31/2012FiledSupplemental Record #2 (GOVERNMENT'S EXHIBITS #1 & #2)
10/31/2012FiledAffirmed
11/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing (Appellant)Denied
03/24/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for an extension of time.
03/24/2014FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/24/2014FiledMandate