judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY MCDONALD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0709
Short Caption:HENRY MCDONALD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD4594-11Filed Date:06/09/2011

Opening Event Date:06/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/05/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/05/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHenry McDonaldY
Howard MarguliesYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kendra D. BriggsYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Howard Margulies, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/23/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Howard Margulies, Esquire
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (50 pgs. -- Tape) 6/9/11 proc.) w/CD.
07/07/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/25/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledRecord Index
07/26/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until October 7, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
09/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 7, 2011
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until October 24, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until October 24, 2011
10/24/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/24/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (22pgs/Tape) 6/9/11 proc. w/CD (Misssing Portion)
11/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until December 23, 2011
12/23/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/23/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/05/2012FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Oberly,Pryor,
08/10/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
09/05/2012FiledMandate