Case: 05-00-00230-CV
05-00-00230-CV
02/14/2000
Divorce
Schlittler, David Charles
Schlittler, Laurie Foster
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/03/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/01/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/01/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
04/11/2002 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
04/11/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
04/11/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
02/26/2002 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |||
02/20/2002 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
02/17/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
01/18/2002 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
01/09/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
12/17/2001 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/11/2001 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
03/20/2000 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
03/15/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/10/2000 | Record due | | |||
03/07/2000 | Letter Filed | | |||
02/25/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
02/25/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
02/22/2000 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |||
02/16/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
02/16/2000 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/14/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/08/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
11/29/1999 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
11/11/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/01/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
04/09/2008 | Status | Destroy record |
07/01/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
David Charles Schlittler | Appellant | David Charles Schlittler |
Jan Dugger | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Janet L. Dugger |
Sue Reeves | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Sue Reeves |
Laurie Foster Schlittler | Appellee | Lisa Baker Canterberry |
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
296-51836-98